+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Taken by Drafter
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 22, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor