+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor