+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (79)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Veto Override Failed in Legislature
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 21, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 28, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 19, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 17, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (12)
April 24, 2015: Do Not Concur
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2015: Do Not Concur
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 42
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 10, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 2
April 7, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
March 16, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 26, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 3
February 20, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor