+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 3, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
January 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor