+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 01/22/2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Amendments Available
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 01/07/2021
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On December 13, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor