+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 65
February 2, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor