+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 7, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
February 11, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 30, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 27
January 29, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 28
January 26, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor