+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/15/2019
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Zac Perry
Type:
Primary Sponsor