+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Process
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 28, 2012 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 25, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2013: Do Not Pass
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor