+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 02/18/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
- First Reading
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Natural Resources
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Natural Resources
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 01/30/2019
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
- Introduced
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Walt Sales
Type:
Primary Sponsor