+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (60)
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On November 23, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 28, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On October 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor