+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On November 23, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 12, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
On November 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 28, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On October 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor