+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 01/27/2021
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 29, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 28, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 13, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor