+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 29, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 27, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 21, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 24, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 20, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor