+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (54)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Taxation
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 02/12/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- First Reading
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 01/23/2019
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- Introduced
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 16, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mary Ann Dunwell
Type:
Primary Sponsor