+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 03/16/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business and Labor
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business and Labor
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/11/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/01/2021
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 2, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor