+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 29, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor