+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 31, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 21, 2012 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 9, 2013: Do Concur with SA
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2013: Do Concur with SA
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 1
March 23, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 15, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 10
February 7, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
February 6, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 100
February 1, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor