+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 21, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 14, 2012 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 13, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 4, 2012 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 27, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 9, 2012 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On October 23, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 3
February 16, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 5
February 13, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 9
January 31, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 100
January 24, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor