+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/22/2019
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- Introduced
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 13, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kimberly Dudik
Type:
Primary Sponsor