+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On December 27, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 10, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 13, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
March 26, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 12
February 5, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
February 4, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 100
January 31, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor