+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 16, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 15, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 7, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 4, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 24, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On October 12, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 15, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 7
March 14, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
March 10, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 10
January 31, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor