+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Motion Failed
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 10, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 9, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On November 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 15, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 28, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 23
April 28, 2011: Suspend Rules to Accept HB 174-Kerns
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2011: Take from Jud Comm to 2nd Rd-Vincent
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 24
April 27, 2011: AMD-1 Vincent D/PASS
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
April 27, 2011: Do Concur as Amended
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 23
February 11, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 28
February 4, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor