+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 31, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 27, 2012 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 21, 2012 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 19, 2012 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 17, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (9)
March 28, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 35
February 15, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
February 2, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor