+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On November 16, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 10, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 9, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On November 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On August 6, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 11
March 8, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 5
March 4, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
January 18, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 9
January 17, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 8
January 17, 2011: AMD-HB 17 O'Neil D/PASS
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 85
January 14, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor