+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (78)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments
- 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted
- On Motion Rules Suspended
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Rereferred to Committee
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 31, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 23, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 9, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 20, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (13)
April 27, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 7
April 26, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
April 20, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 8, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 22
April 7, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
March 26, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2011: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 34
March 25, 2011: AMD-001 Hollandsworth D/PASS
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 6
February 5, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor