+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Requested (Local Government Fiscal Impact)
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 4, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 12, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor