+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (65)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Finance and Claims
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 02/07/2019
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Finance and Claims
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Finance and Claims
- First Reading
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Appropriations
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Appropriations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 01/28/2019
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Education
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Education
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 01/16/2019
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Education
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On September 13, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Bruce Grubbs
Type:
Primary Sponsor