+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Hearing
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 1, 2013 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 18, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 45
February 7, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor