+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Taxation
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 01/21/2021
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- Introduced
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 3, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 12, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor