+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 22, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
On December 19, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor