+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Human Services
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 01/24/2019
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Back for Redo
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 12, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kathy Kelker
Type:
Primary Sponsor