+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 22, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 31, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 27, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 17, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 16, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 29, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 28, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 27, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On November 4, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor