+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House
On February 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On October 26, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On October 23, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On October 3, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On September 30, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 16, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On July 7, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
February 9, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
January 16, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
January 15, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 6
January 14, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor