+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (68)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
On April 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
- First Reading
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 1, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On October 23, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 15, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On October 10, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On September 16, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (9)
April 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 22, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 19
April 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 17
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 30
March 11, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 29
March 11, 2015: AMD-001 Regier D/PASS
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 56
February 12, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor