+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 29, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 9, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On December 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On September 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor