+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (71)
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
- Rereferred to Committee
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 16, 2016 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On December 12, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 9, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On August 31, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor