+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 12, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On December 2, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 14, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 11, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On September 17, 2014 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On August 21, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor