+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Judiciary
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/27/2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Judiciary
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendments Available
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor List Modified
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/11/2021
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
On December 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor