+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Judiciary
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/29/2019
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/11/2019
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
On January 6, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 7, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On August 22, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kenneth L Holmlund
Type:
Primary Sponsor