+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (59)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 04/03/2019
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Judiciary
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Appropriations
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 03/18/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/17/2019
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On July 30, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Frank Fleming
Type:
Primary Sponsor