+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Taxation
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 02/04/2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- First Reading
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendments Available
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 01/12/2021
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On December 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On October 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On September 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On July 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor