+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (45)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 5, 2016 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
On December 2, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 28, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 22, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 17, 2016 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor