+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Process
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
- Hearing
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for Executive Action
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 9, 2010 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 8, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On December 7, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 30, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 20, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 9, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On June 7, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jon C Sesso
Type:
Primary Sponsor