+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Judiciary
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/12/2021
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 3, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 29, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 28, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On December 24, 2020 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor