+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 5, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- First Reading
On January 2, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 26, 2014 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On November 25, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On November 21, 2014 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 18, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 16, 2014 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
January 13, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 3
January 8, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor