+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- On Motion Rules Suspended
- Returned to House
On January 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to Senate
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Introduced
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 13, 2012 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On August 24, 2012 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (7)
January 19, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
January 19, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
January 19, 2013: SuspRules HB 1 - 2nd Rd to 3rd Rd - Wittich
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 4
January 17, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 17
January 11, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
January 10, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
January 8, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor