+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
- On Motion Rules Suspended
- 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to House with Amendments
- On Motion Rules Suspended
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Hearing
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 9, 2010 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On October 28, 2010 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On September 13, 2010 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (9)
January 25, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 12
January 22, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2011: Suspend Rules to place HB1 on 3rd Rd-Essmann
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 19
January 13, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 32
January 10, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor