+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1845ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104998D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1845H1
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104998D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100872D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2017: Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2017: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 21, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor