+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolutions Calendar
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee to Floor
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- S offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor